This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 12:01:17 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA VS. ORTIZ, MARCELINO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2009 HSBC BANK USA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORTIZ, MARCELINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0422

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS

Defendants

TELLEZ ANA CLAIMANT

ORTIZ MARCELINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP - GAYLE E JAMESON ESQ

Attorney at MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. MAILED . RECEIPT # ELM333333007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY: LUKE DANIELS ESQ. FOR GAYLE E. JAMESON ESQ. . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/16/09 , FOR (HSBC BANK USA), ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS , AGAINST (ORTIZ, MARCELINO) , (TELLEZ, ANA) CLAIMANT , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 15900 FELLOWSHIP STREET, LA PUENTE, CA 91744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 05/29/09 . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 06/16/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2009
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (TELLEZ, ANA) CLAIMANT SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: IN WHOLE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF ANA TELLEZ . RECEIPT # 985CRC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT ANA TELLEZ . . RECEIPT # 985CRC . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/20/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANA TELLEZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (TELLEZ, ANA) CLAIMANT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less