This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:46:33 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCI VS. GONZALEZ, MAXIMINO

Case Summary

On 03/23/2009 HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ, MAXIMINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0273

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

GONZALEZ MAXIMINO

GONZALEZ MARIA MERCEDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE ENDRES LAW FIRM - DAVID R. ENDRES

Attorney at THE ENDRES LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GONZALEZ, MAXIMINO) , (GONZALEZ, MARIA MERCEDEZ) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/16/09 , FOR (HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) , AGAINST (GONZALEZ, MAXIMINO) , (GONZALEZ, MARIA MERCEDEZ) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 520 SAINT MALO AVENUE, LA PUENTE, CA 91744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. EL MONTE SHERIFF (MYG) . RECEIPT # ELM267392030 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS-UNLAWFUL DETAINER-EVICTION;VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UD PREJUDGMENT;CIVIL SHEET;ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, MAXIMINO) . COSTS OF $ 127.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS-UNLAWFUL DETAINER-EVICTION;VERIFIED COMPLAINTFOR UD PREJUDGMENT;CIVIL SHEET;ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, MARIA MERCEDEZ) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS;UNLAWFUL DETAINER-EVICTION;VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UD PREJUDGMENT;COVER SHEET; ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.