This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:34:39 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCI VS. CARRILLO, JOSE M

Case Summary

On 03/11/2009 HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARRILLO, JOSE M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0223

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE CE

Defendant

CARRILLO JOSE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT DFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS - EDWARD A. TREDER

Attorney at BARRETT DFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARDED TO EL MONTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT . RECEIPT # ELM478900008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 50.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY: EMEKA G. ONWUALU ESQ. FOR EDWARD A. TREDER ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/27/09 , FOR (HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE CERTIFICATES ISSUED BY DEUTSCHE ALT-A SECURITIES MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST SERIES 2006-AR3 , AGAINST (CARRILLO, JOSE M) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1046 FEATHER AVENUE, LA PUENTE, CA 91746 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 04/09/09 . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/27/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FORM; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & VERIFICATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (CARRILLO, JOSE M) . COSTS OF $ 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FORM; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & VERIFICATION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS IN CARE OF NAME TENANT, JOSE M. CARRILLO . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CARRILLO, JOSE M) . RECEIPT # ELM478900007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less