Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 11:34:35 (UTC).

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC VS BORDEN, JAE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2006 HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BORDEN, JAE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0132

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BORDEN JAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANDRA, SAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • JUDGMENT GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA, SAM