This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 13:56:44 (UTC).

HAPNER, JEREMY DBA STAINED CON VS. BUILT INC.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2010 HAPNER, JEREMY DBA STAINED CON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BUILT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4929

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAPNER JEREMY DBA STAINED CONCRETE ORIGINALS

Defendant

BUILT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2011

DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2010

DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2010

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO BUILT, INC. C/O JOHN SOFIO , AND SERVED AS TO BUILT, INC. C/O JOHN SOFIO BY SUB-SERVING TODD HUNT, POSTALWORKS, EMPLOYEE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/13/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

DocketAMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED CHANGING THE ADDRESS OF DEF BUILT INC. 7257 BEVERLY BLVD STE. 100 LOS ANGELES CA 90036 ,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/13/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2010

DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2010

DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/12/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625027. HEARING SET FOR 06/25/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketRECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAC279625027 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketFICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less