This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 16:12:07 (UTC).

GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER VS. DAKO, BEN

Case Summary

On 09/16/2010 GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DAKO, BEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOBBI TILLMON and LESLIE E. BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0837

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

BOBBI TILLMON

LESLIE E. BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

DAKO BEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - BRUCE J GUTTMAN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/17/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # 451225007 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 0.00 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (DAKO, BEN) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DAKO, BEN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (DAKO, BEN) ON 12/08/10 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/08/10 . FOR (GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) . AGAINST (DAKO, BEN) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 8240 BEVERLY BLVD. #14, LOS ANGELES, CA 90048 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 CHAMBERS RE: APPLICATION FOR POSTING OF SUMMONSA ND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED. BY JUDGE BOBBI TILLMON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 006 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # BH451225001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006. RE: APPLICATION FOR POSTING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. (REQUEST PLACED IN DEPT 006 MAILBOX).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) FOR REJECTION OF APPLICATION TO POST SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; A $20 FILING FEE REQUIRED. SUBMITTED ON 10/13/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068007.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUTTMAN FAMILY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTTMAN BRUCE J.