This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 07:18:37 (UTC).

GREENE, LANI VS. KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES

Case Summary

On 06/17/2009 GREENE, LANI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY MELINE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0127

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAY MELINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENE LANI

Defendant

KAPAKE ROBERT CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/18/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RAY MELINE, PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF RULING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 9:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): OPERATION NEEDS , ON 10/23/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 10/14/09 AT 10:00A M. IN DEPT. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • CLERK`S NOTICE THAT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE HAS BEEN GRANTED FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # MAL472300001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/28/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (KAPAKE, ROBERT CHARLES) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/28/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 . RECEIPT # MAL472300010 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/31/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (GREENE, LANI) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (GREENE, LANI) IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 3.61 CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FEEWAIVER . HEARING SET FOR 08/03/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003

    Read MoreRead Less