This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 22:09:02 (UTC).

GOLL, THEODORE R. VS. INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF TH

Case Summary

On 01/26/2006 GOLL, THEODORE R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF TH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0240

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLL THEODORE R.

Defendant

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB A CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/18/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/28/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2006
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FPS . HEARING SET FOR 03/01/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant