This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2016 at 07:55:36 (UTC).

GMAC VS. J & R FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/14/2009 GMAC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J R FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3731

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMAC INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

FERNANDEZ SR JORGE AKA FERNANDEZ JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

J & R FERNANDEZ INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP - MICHAEL D. VAN LOCHEM ESQ

Attorney at VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/10/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM448028105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/23/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&R FERNANDEZ INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D