This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 11:11:06 (UTC).

GMAC LLC, VS. JOHNSON, BRUCE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2008 GMAC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHNSON, BRUCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A. MCSORLEY and J. CARMICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2478

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

J. CARMICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMAC LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

JAMES MONA LISA AKA JAMES MONA L.AKA JAMES MONA AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHNSON BRUCE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP - JESSICA E. FLYNN

Attorney at VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/18/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (JAMES, MONA LISA) AKA (JAMES, MONA L.) AKA (JAMES, MONA) AN INDIVIDUAL , AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (JOHNSON, BRUCE) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (JAMES, MONA LISA) AKA (JAMES, MONA L.) AKA (JAMES, MONA) AN INDIVIDUAL , AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. THIS DEFENDANT HAS BEEN DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • ORDER RE: WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) SIGNED BY ROBERT A. MCSORLEY, COMMISSIONER AND FILED. WRIT FOR-2006 CHEVROLET IMPALA MOTOR VEHICLE, VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION # 2G1WB58K269383373 WITH A VALUE OF $10300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004 FOR CONSIDERATION PROPOSED ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHNSON, BRUCE) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 85.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, CLAIM AND DELIVERY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, CLAIM AND DELIVERY, AND HEARING FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/17/08 AT 01:45P M, IN DEPT. 004 . RECEIPT # NEW253967004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRE-TRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: OF MONINA MANALANSAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/09 AT 08:00A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 09/30/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW253967008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 004 OF HONORABLE PER DIEM JUDGE PRO TEM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant