This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 05:32:39 (UTC).

GMAC LLC VS. C & T HOME IMPROVEMENT & CONST

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 GMAC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against C T HOME IMPROVEMENT CONST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and VICKEN I. SIMONIAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0340

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

VICKEN I. SIMONIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMAC LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DARE CLYDE E. AKA DARE CLYDE AN INDIVIDUAL

C & T HOME IMPROVEMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP - MICHAEL D. VANLOCHEM ESQ

Attorney at VANLOCHEM & CHESNEY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. VICKEN I. SIMONIAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/11/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION ADR PKG. SEE ATTACHMENT PAGE FOR DOCUMENT LIST. FILED. SERVED AS TO (C & T HOME IMPROVEMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC.), A CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION ADR PKG. SEE ATTACHMENT PAGE FOR DOCUMENT LIST. FILED. SERVED AS TO (DARE, CLYDE E.) AKA (DARE, CLYDE), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, CLAIM AND DELIVERY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION, CLAIM AND DELIVERY, AND HEARING FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/23/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # ELM482668015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR PRE-TRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM482668013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/09 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/06/09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.