Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 19:46:04 (UTC).

GL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC VS. GONZALEZ, ALIDA

Case Summary

On 05/01/2009 GL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ALIDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1370

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GL RECOVERY GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GONZALEZ ALIDA AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPP LAW CORPORATION - STEPP, THOMAS E.

Attorney at STEPP LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION TO VACATE DEFAULT PG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • ORDER RE: VACATE THE DEFAULT ENTERED ON OCTOBER 23. 2009 AGAINST DEFENDANT ALIDA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • REQUEST RE: VACATE DEFAULT RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/28/10 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC), A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: THE COURT CAN NOT PROCESS YOUR REQUEST, DUE TO REQUEST FOR DEFAULT ENTERED ON OCTOBER 23, 2009. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUBMITTED ON 03/26/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY COMM. LIA R. MARTIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 11/12/09 IS HEREBY VACATED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 04/26/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC), A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT- PLEASE RESUBMIT THE REQUEST PACKET WITH A CALCULATION AS TO THE REQUESTED ATTORNEY FEES. (PER JUDGE'S ORDER) THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 07/21/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GONZALEZ, ALIDA), AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT;OSC;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT;ADR; STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, ALIDA), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/12/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less