This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 19:40:16 (UTC).

GILBERT, MARY E VS ALLIED VAN LINES INC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2009 GILBERT, MARY E filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALLIED VAN LINES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7519

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILBERT MARY E

Defendants

R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC

ALLIED VAN LINES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROUDFOOT & QUACH LLP

Defendant Attorney

WILDISH & NIALIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2011
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • RETURNED MAIL: MINUTE ORDER MAILED 5/18/10 TO PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • REPLY OF DEFTS ALLIED TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL. FILED BY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • RETURNED MAIL: MINUTE ORDER MAILED 3/5/10 TO PLAINTIFF ATTY.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 05/18/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • OSC SET 03/05/10, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DEPARTMENT 77 HAS BEEN DESIGNATED THE MASTER CALENDAR COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES ARE NOW SET IN DEPARTMENT 77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/09, IN DEPT 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED VAN LINES INC. is a litigant