This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 05:54:14 (UTC).

GE MONEY BANK VS. REYES, CORA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 GE MONEY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REYES, CORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0366

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GE MONEY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL CONSUMER CARD COMPANY

Defendant

REYES CORAAKA REYES CORA YVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FARLEY & KUMP, LLP - KARY R. KUMP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FARLEY & KUMP, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE RECEIVED FROM THE POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/01/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO COURT JUDGMENT DESK RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW; ADR INFORMATION PACKET FILED. SERVED AS TO (REYES, CORA)AKA (REYES, CORA YVETTE) . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM001008004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/10/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less