This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 12:17:31 (UTC).

GCFS, INC. VS. COLON, MELISSA R.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2009 GCFS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COLON, MELISSA R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4536

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

COLON MELISSA R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC. - GARY A. BEMIS

Attorney at LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/10/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (COLON, MELISSA R. ) FILED. COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/28/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028040.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEMIS, GARY A