This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2016 at 10:00:50 (UTC).

GALLUS TEXTILES OF L A INC VS VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2010 GALLUS TEXTILES OF L A INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1941

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLUS TEXTILES OF L A INC

Defendants

VANOUNOU ZION

VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NETZAH & JANKIELEWICZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW/CONFERENCE MINUTE ORDER ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • OSC SET FOR 02/23/11, 0830 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/10, IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALLUS TEXTILES OF L. A. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant