Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 06:04:10 (UTC).

FOX RENT A CAR VS HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 FOX RENT A CAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3866

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOX RENT A CAR INC.

Defendant

HUMPHREY JARETTE CHAUNTELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - RUPP, H. MARC

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

RUPP H. MARC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 11C03866 TO LAM11CS3866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (FOX RENT A CAR), INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # SM278868023S .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WES RE: REVIEW COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/16/12 . FOR (FOX RENT A CAR), INC. . AGAINST (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) . PRINCIPAL $ 5750.00 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 435.00 . INTEREST $ 1959.73 . COSTS $ 325.00 . TOTAL $ 8,469.73 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) ON 03/12/12 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 325.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 760.00 FILED BY (FOX RENT A CAR), INC. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADDENDUM; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT; CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HUMPHREY, JARETTE CHAUNTELL) BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 1/11/12 8:15PM . COSTS OF $ 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM000868001. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/28/11

    Read MoreRead Less