This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 00:17:50 (UTC).

FOREMOST AIRPORT VEGAS VS. SBCA, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2009 FOREMOST AIRPORT VEGAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SBCA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1467

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMOST AIRPORT VEGAS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

SBCA INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SMALL BUSINESS CONSULTING AGENCY AN UN

MERINO SHARON AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LEE R. GOLDBERG - LEE R. GOLDBERG

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LEE R. GOLDBERG

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JEFF R. WHEATLEY - KERRY G. OSAKI

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JEFF R. WHEATLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MERINO, SHARON), AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # POM448028003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED BY (FOREMOST AIRPORT VEGAS), LTD, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/27/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM505123015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less