Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 17:21:16 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS URELLANA, IVETTE

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against URELLANA, IVETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN KRALIK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6725

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

ORELLANA IVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL, TODD A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • ORDER FOR INCORRECT NAME SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN KRALIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR INCORRECT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER - PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • NO CASE ACTION ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • OSC SET 08/27/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. F44, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less