This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 12:09:50 (UTC).

FONG, SHANNON VS. BLITZ, MARK ANDREW

Case Summary

On 05/09/2008 FONG, SHANNON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLITZ, MARK ANDREW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JANE GODFREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0869

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JANE GODFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FONG SHANNON

Defendants

EVANS BRIAN

BLITZ MARK ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/10/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED AMENDING THE NAME OF DEFENDANT #1 AND ADDIND A SECOND DEFENDANT ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED , 2ND REQUEST (NO SASE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (FONG, SHANNON) FOR REJECTION OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR RESET REJECTED: FORM SC-100A SHOULD ONLY BE SUBMITTED IF THERE ARE MORE THAN TWO DEFENDANTS. DO NOT ATTACH FORM SC-100A OR CHECK THE BOX IN SECTION 1 OF FORM SC-100 IF THERE ARE ONLY 2 DEFENDANTS. SUBMITTED ON 08/04/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/27/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO P1 FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR RESET BY FAX FILING REJECTED: CREDIT CARD INFORMATION IS NOT INCLUDED. PLEASE COMPLETE SECTION 3 OF THE FAX FILING COVER SHEET. ALSO YOUR FAX PHONE NUMBER IS MISSING AND PLEASE COMPLETE THE FILING PARTIES INFORMATION SUBMITTED ON 06/23/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED , 1ST REQUEST, (NO SASE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (BLITZ, MARK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1080512E2760 . HEARING SET FOR 07/02/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (BLITZ, MARK)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.