This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:54:47 (UTC).

FITNESS CLUB WAREHOUSE INC. VS. CIANFAGLINE, TRINA

Case Summary

On 03/28/2008 FITNESS CLUB WAREHOUSE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CIANFAGLINE, TRINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JANE GODFREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0529

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JANE GODFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FITNESS CLUB WAREHOUSE INC.

Defendant

CIANFAGLINE TRINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/18/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #2 FROM COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/05/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (FITNESS CLUB WAREHOUSE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #1 FROM COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 07/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED AS TO (CIANFAGLINE, TRINA) . (MANNER OF SERVICE IS NOT INDICATED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) (CIANFAGLINE, TRINA) . THE VENUE CHALLENGE WILL BE CONSIDERED BY THE BENCH OFFICER ON THE DATE OF TRIAL. ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CIANFAGLINE, TRINA) FOR REJECTION OF VENUE CHALLENGE REJECTED: YOUR LETTER MUST REFLECT THAT A COPY HAS BEEN MAILED OR DELIVERED TO PLAINTIFF. SUBMITTED ON 04/28/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 05/28/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less