This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 17:59:59 (UTC).

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT VS. MORALES, FRANKLIN E.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORALES, FRANKLIN E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3584

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO U

Defendant

MORALES FRANKLIN E. AKA MORALES FRANKLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP - JOHN P KENOSIAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (MORALES, FRANKLIN E.) AKA (MORALES,FRANKLIN) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 07/08/16 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 08/08/16 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION) SUCCESSOR IN INTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 1718.74 . RECEIPT # NOR538412037 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1199.82 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/09/15 , FOR (FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION) SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS) AS ASSIGNEE OF (CITIBANK USA) N.A. , AGAINST (MORALES, FRANKLIN E.) AKA (MORALES,FRANKLIN) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 1718.74 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 1199.82 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 2,948.56 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 26.00 FOR CERTIFIED COPIES. RECEIPT # NOR538412038 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM WH 08C03584 TO NOR08CW3584

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AND ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MORALES, FRANKLIN E.) AKA (MORALES,FRANKLIN) , BY SUB-SERVING (FRANKLIN DOE) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ARMANDO V. MORENO, COMMISSIONER TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/03/09 AT 09:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN WH0285409022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.