Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:29:19 (UTC).

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT VS. BASSETT, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2006 FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BASSETT, PAMELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0169

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO P

Defendant

BASSETT PAMELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - BRIAN N. WINN

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC F. FAGAN - JEREMY GOLDEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC F. FAGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/19/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DIV/DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW. . COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED/SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 01/11/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION) SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (PALISADES ACQUISITION I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (PROVIDIAN NATIONAL BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (BASSETT, PAMELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY (FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION) SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (PALISADES ACQUISITION I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (PROVIDIAN NATIONAL BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/17/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/23/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (BASSETT, PAMELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION) SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (PALISADES ACQUISITION I LLC) AS ASSIGNEE OF (PROVIDIAN NATIONAL BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BASSETT, PAMELA) . RECEIPT # MAL136401004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BASSETT, PAMELA) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # MAL136401006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/17/07 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/24/06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Golden, Jeremy S.