This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 06:46:11 (UTC).

FINE, SHALOM VS. JONAS, ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 FINE, SHALOM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONAS, ANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0262

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROL J. HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINE SHALOM

Defendants

JONAS ANDERSON

BYRNE MARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/07/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. CAROL J. HALLOWITZ, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. NOTICE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • REQUEST RE: PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH REQUEST TO RE-SET THE COURT DATE OF 10/15/09. RECEIVED AND FILED. THE REQUEST WILL BE PLACED IN THE FILE FOR COMMISSIONER HALLOWITZ CONSIDERATION AND ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 RE: SMALL CLAIMS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/15/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 RE: SMALL CLAIMS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 08/20/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/20/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004. RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/19/09 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 004. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/19/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/21/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN BH458341006. HEARING SET FOR 04/01/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 004.

    Read MoreRead Less