Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2016 at 07:14:39 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. VS. STANOVICH, MARTI A.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 FIA CARD SERVICES, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STANOVICH, MARTI A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3328

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

Defendant

STANOVICH MARTI A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM11C03328 TO NOR11CC3328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/11/12 . FOR (FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A.) . AGAINST (STANOVICH, MARTI A.) . PRINCIPAL $ 16800.80 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 434.50 . TOTAL $ 17,235.30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO SEE DEFAULT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: PLANTIFF'S SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (STANOVICH, MARTI A.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (STANDOVICH, MARTI A.) BY SUBSERVING MARILY BLACKWOOD . COSTS OF $ 64.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN COM503382058.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA SUMMERHAYES, COMMISSIONER TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/30/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 00N . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less