This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 17:52:12 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. VS. PALMA, MARS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2010 FIA CARD SERVICES N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PALMA, MARS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LIA R. MARTIN, BRIAN LEVY and MICHAEL SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0235

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LIA R. MARTIN

BRIAN LEVY

MICHAEL SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.

Defendant

PALMA MARS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C. - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. MICHAEL SMITH, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE . MOTION IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # WAIVED . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/18/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • OPPOSITION RE: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY (PALMA, MARS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.) IN THE SUM OF $ 2.25 FOR FAX FILING . RECEIPT # ELM235338002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • DEFENDANT MARS PALMA RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (FIA CARD SERVICES N.A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVE PLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR A NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 08/02/10 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (PALMA, MARS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • REQUEST(S) TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (PALMA, MARS) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PERSONALLY HAND DELIVERING A TRUE COPY OF THE ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS TO THE APPLICANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION;ADR PACKET;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PALMA, MARS) . COSTS OF $ 68.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM511049007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE COMM. LIA R. MARTIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMM. LIA R. MARTIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/02/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brachfeld, Erica L