This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2016 at 11:51:09 (UTC).

FEIN, ARTHUR VS JAS MADISON I, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/16/2007 FEIN, ARTHUR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAS MADISON I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2596

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEIN ARTHUR

Defendants

OPTIMA ASSET MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

ATLAS INTERNATIONAL & ASSOCIATES

MCGANN ASSET MANAGEMENT INC.

JAS MADISON I LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA07S02596 TO ING07ST2596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 008 , HON. DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 59 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS FOR DEFTS AGAINST PLTF :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/04/07 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (OPTIMA ASSET MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/04/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ATLAS INTERNATIONAL & ASSOCIATES) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/04/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MCGANN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.) BY SUB-SERVING PAULA LAPLOUNT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/04/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 8 RE: JUDGE'S REQUEST .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 008 , HON. DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL AT TRIAL. . CLERK HEREBY GIVES NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 8 RE: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT REQUESTING DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 452476 . HEARING SET FOR 12/04/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLAS INTERNATIONAL & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MCGANN ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant