This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 06:09:34 (UTC).

FEDEX CUSTOMER INFORMATION VS ZICRON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/16/2008 FEDEX CUSTOMER INFORMATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZICRON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8428

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDEX CUSTOMER INFORMATION

Defendant

ZICRON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUI, LONG K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • REFUND CARD #785068 FOR $25.00 ISSUED TO SAKAIDA & BUI.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND SIGNED BY JUDGE STEPHEN P. PFAHLER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND SUBMITTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - WRIT OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • A/C - WRIT OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORG COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2009
  • CCP 1033 DECLARATION. +

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • SUBSERVE 12-18-08 MAILED 12-18-08 DEC OF DUE DIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED AND COPY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/09, IN DEPT F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less