This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 08:29:40 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO VS. LUKER, RAYMOND E.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2010 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUKER, RAYMOND E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0348

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION ITS SUCCESORS AND/OR ASSIGNS

Defendants

LUKER MARIA T.

LUKER RAYMOND E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITE DUNCAN, LLP - PARTRIDGE, WILLIAM L.

Attorney at PITE DUNCAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/01/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/26/10 , FOR (FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, ITS SUCCESORS AND/OR ASSIGNS) , AGAINST (LUKER, RAYMOND E.) , (LUKER, MARIA T.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3731 EAST 54TH STREET, MAYWOOD, CA 90270 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. **FWD TO SHERIFF'S DEPT** . RECEIPT # HPK478659023 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (LUKER, RAYMOND E.) , (LUKER, MARIA T.) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LUKER, RAYMOND E.) , (LUKER, MARIA T.) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/03/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK183318009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L Partridge