This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 14:08:19 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP VS MIJANGOS, CARLOS TRINIDAD

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIJANGOS, CARLOS TRINIDAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2363

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP

Defendant

MIJANGOS CARLOS TRINIDAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMEZ, DANIEL RAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2012
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODES 68151 & 68152.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2009
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 07/24/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • ORDER TO POST REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 06/26/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2008
  • ORDER TO POST SIGNED BY JUDGE STEPHEN P. PFAHLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER TO POST REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION & ORDER TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • RETURNED MAIL - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (CARLOS TRINIDAD MIJANGOS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.