This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 05:50:03 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE COR VS. MENDEZ, CUSTODIO

Case Summary

On 03/10/2011 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE COR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENDEZ, CUSTODIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0267

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATIONITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS

Defendant

MENDEZ CUSTODIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITE DUNCAN, LLP - RENEE BELCASTRO

Attorney at PITE DUNCAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/03/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/14/11 , FOR (FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS) , AGAINST (MENDEZ, CUSTODIO) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 6629 JABONERIA RD, BELL GARDENS, CA 90201 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 45.37 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SHERIFF'S . RECEIPT # HPK478659016 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MENDEZ, CUSTODIO) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (MENDEZ, CUSTODIO) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF (FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS) FILED RE: MILITARY STATUS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MENDEZ, CUSTODIO) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ .00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK478659003.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/25/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITE DUNCAN, LLP - RENEE BELCASTRO