This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2016 at 10:07:43 (UTC).

FARRELL, KALEEN VS MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2008 FARRELL, KALEEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINA D. FRIED and JAMES A. STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7662

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINA D. FRIED

JAMES A. STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARRELL KALEEN

Defendant

MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA READY GOLF CENTERS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2009
  • FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 560.75 REFUNDED TO (FARRELL, KALEEN) , RE: PAYMENT TO COURT/NTB REFUND #797649 . CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (FARRELL, KALEEN) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF EXECUTION: YOUR REQUEST COULD NOT BE PROCESSED BECAUSE THERE IS AN ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION ON FILE. ENCLOSED IS YOUR CHECK #1507. SUBMITTED ON 06/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST TO RECEIVE FUNDS BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FARRELL, KALEEN) . PAYMENT TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • NOTICE SENT TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR BY CERTIFIED MAIL # 7008 1830 0003 2621 8067. DUE BACK 7/16/09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED AND THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 674.51 PAID. FULL SATISFACTION JUDGMENT ENTERED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) ON 06/30/09 . RECEIPT # LAV270105 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED PURSUANT TO SECTION 116.850 CCP OR 116.860 OR 724.020 CCP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • RECEIVED WRIT AT THE WINDOW FROM /P1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWC , HON. JAMES A. STEELE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM TO PLAINTIFF FILED. SERVED AS TO (FARRELL, KALEEN) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWC , HON. MINA D. FRIED, COMR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 03/10/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) IN THE SUM OF $ 1500.00 , BECAUSE PLAINTIFF BREACHED ORAL AGREEMENT TO PERFORM, CAUSED DAMAGE TO THE BUSINESS OPERATION BY NOT PERFORMING AND DAMAGE TO . RECEIPT # LAV533569023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED. BY D1 FOR DEFENDANTS CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: CLERK`S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE HEARING RETURNED AS TO (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER. UNABLE TO FORWARD, ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. NWC FOR CONSIDERATION OF UNTIMELY POSTPONEMENT . RECEIPT # LAV533569009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 01/12/09 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. NWC , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.) DBA (READY GOLF CENTERS) BY SUB-SERVING MARK KARGE- HEAD GOLF PROFESSIONAL . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV539201007 . HEARING SET FOR 11/26/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC is a litigant