This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 16:51:09 (UTC).

FAMSA INC. VS USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 FAMSA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL LOWENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2032

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL LOWENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAMSA INC. DBA LA CANASTA

Defendant

USUNA GARCIA JESUS LONGINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM HP 08S02032 TO DOW08SH2032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DANIEL LOWENTHAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR TIME PAYMENT. MOTION GRANTED AS TO (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) . PAYMENTS ARE TO BE MADE AT THE RATE OF $ 80.00 PER MONTH (WEEK), BEGINNING ON 02/05/09 AND CONTINUING ON THE 5TH DAY OF EACH MONTH (WEEK) UNTIL PAID IN FULL. UPON ANY MISSED PAYMENT THE BALANCE BECOMES DUE IMMEDIATELY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • NANCY ESTRADA SWORN AS INTERPRETER FOR DEFENDANT, (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR RETURNED OPPOSING THE REQUEST OF INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INSTALLMENT PAYMENTS FILED BY (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/19/08 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2008
  • REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS AND FINANCIAL DECLARATION FILED AS TO (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/07/08 . FOR (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) . AGAINST (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) . PRINCIPAL $ 1504.17 . COSTS $ 125.00 . TOTAL $ 1629.17 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DANIEL LOWENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY GRICELDA BONILLA . DEFENDANT APPEARING JESUS LONGINA USUNA GARCIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • GRICELDA BONILLA SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR PLAINTIFF, (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR DEFENDANT, (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (USUNA GARCIA, JESUS LONGINA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/07/08 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN HPK510620027. HEARING SET FOR 10/07/08 AT 10:00 AM IN DPT. 002.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.