This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 16:33:22 (UTC).

FAMSA INC. VS JUAREZ, MARIA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 FAMSA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAREZ, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL LOWENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2093

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL LOWENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAMSA INC.

Defendant

JUAREZ MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM HP 08S02093 TO DOW08SH2093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 25.00 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST {LINES 16 & 17}. $ 250.53 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST {LINE 19}. $ 2431.27 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT {LINE 15}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # HPK538978019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ORDER VACATING STAY OF EXECUTION SIGNED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 002 FOR CONSIDERATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE STAY OF EXECUTION AND TO ISSUE WRIT FILED BY (FAMSA INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/08/08 . FOR (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) . AGAINST (JUAREZ, MARIA) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 125.00 . TOTAL $ 2625.00 . PAYMENTS ARE TO BE MADE AT THE RATE OF $ 125.00 PER MONTH, BEGINNING ON 11/15/08 AND ON THE 15TH DAY OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL. UPON MISSED PAYMENT(S) , THEN THE ENTIRE BALANCE BECOMES DUE IMMEDIATELY. A COPY OF THE STIPULATION IS GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES THIS DATE IN OPEN COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DANIEL LOWENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY MELISSA GIL . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (FAMSA INC.) DBA (LA CANASTA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JUAREZ, MARIA) BY SUB-SERVING CARLOS ESTRADA: CO-HABITANT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/08/08 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN HPK478659056. HEARING SET FOR 10/08/08 AT 10:00 AM IN DPT. 002.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.