This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 14:20:04 (UTC).

EXECUTIVE HOME CARE, INC. VS. BARAK, RONALD

Case Summary

On 09/04/2008 EXECUTIVE HOME CARE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARAK, RONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN, ROBERT ARONOFF, GERALD ROSENBERG and GUNTHER SCHIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1642

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

ROBERT ARONOFF

GERALD ROSENBERG

GUNTHER SCHIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXECUTIVE HOME CARE INC.

Defendant

BARAK RONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/24/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO RICHARD HARTLEY AND LESLEY HOWARD FOR EXECUTIVE HOME CARE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ROBERT ARONOFF JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/15/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:30P M, IN DEPT. WEA , HON. GERALD ROSENBERG PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:30P M, IN DEPT. WEA , HON. GERALD ROSENBERG PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/P0STPONEMENT OF (BARAK, RONALD) IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON{S}: YOUR REQUEST WILL BE ATTACHED TO THE CASE FILE FOR THE BENCH OFFICER'S CONSIDERATION ON THE DATE OF THE HEARING. CASE REMAINS SET ON ORIGINAL HEARING DATE. ALL PARTIES SHOULD BE PRESENT ON THAT DATE AND TIME . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO RICHARD HARTLEY AND LESLEY HOWARD FOR EXECUTIVE HOME .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. GUNTHER SCHIFF JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 11/10/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEH , HON. ALLAN J. GOODMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/15/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . PLAINTIFFS WITNESS CARMEN CIOCEA FAILS TO APPEAR AS ORDERED BY ISSUED SUBPEONA. PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING FILED. SERVED AS TO CARMEN CIOCEA . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (BARAK, RONALD) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/10/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 11/10/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 2.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW518909002 .

    Read MoreRead Less