This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:10:58 (UTC).

EPPS, CHERYL L. VS. KIRKLAND, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2008 EPPS, CHERYL L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIRKLAND, PAMELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK ARIEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0163

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK ARIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPPS CHERYL L.

Defendants

KIRKLAND AKILA MI

KIRKLAND PAMELA GU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/15/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. FRANK ARIEL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (EPPS, CHERYL L.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR RESET/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: IF YOU WOULD LIKE TO DISMISS CASE PLEASE COMPLETE BOTTOM PORTION OF FORM ONLY. 08/06/06 NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY COURT ORDERED SUBMITTED ON 08/05/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/06/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED ,2ND REQUEST (SASE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/30/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED #1 NO SASE PROVIDED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 03/12/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/12/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • PLAINTIFF NOTIFIED AT TIME OF FILING DEFENDANT(S) IS NOT DESIGNATED PROPERLY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.