This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 22:50:23 (UTC).

ENGEL & ENGEL LLP VS GFTC INC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2010 ENGEL ENGEL LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GFTC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7631

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENGEL & ENGEL LLP

Defendants

GFTC INC

NEW GLASPRO INC

GREEN S JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CHAD BIGGINS

Defendant Attorney

CLINTON & CLINTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketOSC CONTINUED TO 09/12/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES-OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketSC CONTINUED TO 07/28/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketSC CONTINUED TO 04/29/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketSC CONTINUED TO 04/15/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/06/11 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketOSC SET FOR 11/19/10, 0830 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW/CONFERENCE MINUTE ORDER ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketNON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/14/10, IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketCMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less