This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 17:36:52 (UTC).

E & E ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING R VS. AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2008 E E ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING R filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A. MCSORLEY and WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3556

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E & E ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING RESEARCH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

AMIDNAMIN MARZIEH

LIU JEFF

JAN BECKY

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC

INLAND EMPIRE REALTY HOLDING CO. INC.A CORPORATION

LAN LARRY

LIU JOHN

AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC. A CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ROBIN M. HOU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM08C03556 TO NOR08CC3556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR (E & E ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING RESEARCH INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/07/09 . FOR (E & E ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING RESEARCH INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . AGAINST (AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC.) A CORP. , (JAN, BECKY) . PRINCIPAL $ 15930.00 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 389.50 . TOTAL $ 16,319.50 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 585{D} CCP FILED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 00N ON 08/06/09 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketDEFAULT REC'VD CG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC.) A CORP. , (JAN, BECKY) ON 01/08/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 389.50 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICANT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (JAN, BECKY) . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (AMIDNAMIN, MARZIEH) ONLY .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (INLAND EMPIRE REALTY HOLDING CO. INC.) A CORPORATION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC.) A CORP. . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (AAA ELECTRONIC SERVICES INC.) A CORP. . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN COM466510007.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/08/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less