This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 07:22:45 (UTC).

DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES VS. GALINDO, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2011 DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GALINDO, JESSICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RITA J. BAIRD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0753

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RITA J. BAIRD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES

Defendant

GALINDO JESSICA IN PRO PER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY L. HILLIKER - JEFFREY L HILLIKER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY L. HILLIKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELA11D00753 TO PAS11UE0753

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINAL AND COPIES FORWARD TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE WITH CHECK AND INSTRUCTIONS. A COPY MAILED BACK TO PLAINTIFF. . RECEIPT # ELA457745009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. RITA J. BAIRD PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING WITH LUKE DANIELS . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/07/11 , FOR (DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES) , AGAINST (GALINDO, JESSICA) IN PRO PER , PAST DUE RENT $ 900.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 210.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 340.00 . TOTAL $ 1,950.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 6639 1/2 E. OLYMPIC BLVD, LOS ANGELES, CA 90022 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. A WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GALINDO, JESSICA) IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/07/11 AT 09:30A M., IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GALINDO, JESSICA) IN PRO PER . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (GALINDO, JESSICA) IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (GALINDO, JESSICA) IN PRO PER IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA134602007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant