This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2016 at 19:12:18 (UTC).

DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES VS. FELIZ, VIVIAN

Case Summary

On 04/14/2010 DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FELIZ, VIVIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0231

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES

Defendant

FELIZ VIVIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GLEN M. NAVIS - GLEN M. NAVIS, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLEN M. NAVIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/08/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELA10D00231 TO PAS10UE0231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO ELA SHERIFF . RECEIPT # ELA451428003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (FELIZ, VIVIAN) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FELIZ, VIVIAN) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 04/24/10 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/27/10 , FOR (DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES) , AGAINST (FELIZ, VIVIAN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 6641 E OLYMPIC BLVD, LOS ANGELES, CA 90022 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA451428001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVIS, GLEN M.