This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 05:47:54 (UTC).

DULCE VIDA PROPERIES VS. GARCIA, FILIBERTA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 DULCE VIDA PROPERIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA, FILIBERTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0127

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DULCE VIDA PROPERIES

Defendant

GARCIA FILIBERTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GLEN M. NAVIS - GLEN M. NAVIS, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLEN M. NAVIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/09/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELA11D00127 TO PAS11UE0127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GARCIA, FILIBERTA) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/02/11 , FOR (DULCE VIDA PROPERIES) , AGAINST (GARCIA, FILIBERTA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 646 S BRADSHAWE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90022 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA217383009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVIS, GLEN M.