This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 14:02:42 (UTC).

DUARTE RAC INC. VS RAMIREZ, RAYNELLE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DUARTE RAC INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMIREZ, RAYNELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM SULLIVAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0997

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM SULLIVAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUARTE RAC INC.

Defendant

RAMIREZ RAYNELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ALH08S00997 TO ALH08G00997

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (RAMIREZ, RAYNELLE) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER; INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:15A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. WILLIAM SULLIVAN, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY SEAN FRANKLIN . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/24/08 . FOR (DUARTE RAC INC.) . AGAINST (RAMIREZ, RAYNELLE) . PRINCIPAL $ 1220.00 . COSTS $ 90.00 . TOTAL $ 1310.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO DEFENDANT. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RAMIREZ, RAYNELLE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/24/08 AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # ALH507217008 . HEARING SET FOR 10/24/08 AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. 002

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.