This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2019 at 03:39:09 (UTC).

DOSS, KEANDRA R VS VILLA NICOLA PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 06/15/2011 DOSS, KEANDRA R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VILLA NICOLA PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3610

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOSS KEANDRA R

Defendant

VILLA NICOLA PROPERTIES LANDLORD DBA AMC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED, COMR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/01/11 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM. CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • CLERK`S NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • RECEIVED BY FAX SC-150 REQUEST TO POSTPONE RECEIVED AS TO (DOSS, KEANDRA R) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/01/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1110617E7163 . HEARING SET FOR 07/27/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant