Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 09:45:56 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS COBIEYA, GABRIELA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COBIEYA, GABRIELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL and B. REAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3096

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL

B. REAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

COBIEYA GABRIELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 118.66 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST {LINES 16 & 17}. $ 96.42 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST {LINE 19}. $ 1364.81 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT {LINE 15}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO VAN NUYS FILE ROOM RE: 1-30-14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CHA11W03096 TO LAV11W03096

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 1060.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 93.66 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # CHA511000004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (COBIEYA, GABRIELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) . FILED BY VANESSA ABARCA, CREDIT MANAGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. F43 , HON. ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL, COMMISSIONER WITH B. REAL, CLERK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/13/12 . FOR (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) . AGAINST (COBIEYA, GABRIELA) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 85.00 . TOTAL $ 2585.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (COBIEYA, GABRIELA) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT F43 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CHA511599016. HEARING SET FOR 01/13/12 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. F43.

    Read MoreRead Less