Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 00:23:31 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. PORTALES, LUIS A

Case Summary

On 06/01/2009 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PORTALES, LUIS A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAIME R. CORRAL and ANA MARIA LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1476

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

Judge

ANA MARIA LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

PORTALES LUIS A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN LLP - LOURDES R. SLINSKY

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DISCOVER BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ANA MARIA LUNA TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 06/01/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (PORTALES, LUIS A) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RECEIPT # HPK538978008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANA MARIA LUNA, SITE JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/07/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE ANA MARIA LUNA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN BRACKEN, LLP - LOURDES R. SLINSKY