Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2016 at 08:21:13 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. KIM, SHELDON

Case Summary

On 07/31/2009 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIM, SHELDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3046

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KIM SHELDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES - KAREN K. AFRA

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING AND/OR APPEALABLE ORDER RETURNED AS TO ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF DUE TO UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (KIM, SHELDON) FILED. COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM AND ADR PACKAGE RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (KIM, SHELDON) FILED. COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN BH053884016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES - KAREN K. AFRA