Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 07:34:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. JONES, TANYA

Case Summary

On 06/03/2009 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONES, TANYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1954

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JONES TANYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN, LLP - KURTISS A. JACOBS

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN KIM. . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DISCOVER BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 12-07-09 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (JONES, TANYA) FILED. COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/07/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS KURTISS A.