This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 12:54:02 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. GARDUNO, URIEL M.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARDUNO, URIEL M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL LOWENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2550

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL LOWENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Defendant

GARDUNO URIEL M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL, HAMMER, & WHITE, APC - PETER R. OSTERMAN

Attorney at SUTTELL, HAMMER, & WHITE, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (DISCOVER BANK),ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM HP 08C02550 TO NOR08CH2550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (DISCOVER BANK),ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # HPK303183021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/02/08 . FOR (DISCOVER BANK),ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD . AGAINST (GARDUNO, URIEL M.) . PRINCIPAL $ 13549.20 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 796.47 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 360.00 . TOTAL $ 14,705.67 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (DISCOVER BANK),ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GARDUNO, URIEL M.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 TO 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GARDUNO, URIEL M.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN HPK478659014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL LOWENTHAL, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/23/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.