This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2016 at 21:12:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. BALIGAD, BENJAMIN

Case Summary

On 04/01/2010 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BALIGAD, BENJAMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BAKER, ANTY PETERS and GEANENE YRIARTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1096

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BAKER

ANTY PETERS

GEANENE YRIARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK A BANK ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF

Defendant

BALIGAD BENJAMIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L. BACHMAN - ROBERT L. BACHMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L. BACHMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/26/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • CASE FILE RECEIVED FROM THE POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (DISCOVER BANK), A BANK ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF DELAWARE FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL-COURT ORDERED CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 06/28/11 SUBMITTED ON 06/23/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SMALL CLAIMS DESK RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2010
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BALIGAD, BENJAMIN), AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # GC68633 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (BALIGAD, BENJAMIN), AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (BALIGAD, BENJAMIN), AN INDIVIDUAL SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: AS LISTED IN CRC 985 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVE PLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR A NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 10/04/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/04/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less