This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2016 at 15:40:14 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE D VS. RENDON, YANETH

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE D filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENDON, YANETH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAIME R. CORRAL and DANIEL LOWENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0164

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

Judge

DANIEL LOWENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Defendant

RENDON YANETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN LLC - ANN K. MERRILL

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 01/21/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (RENDON, YANETH) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY JUDGE DANIEL LOWENTHAL TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/28/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN HPK478659041.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL LOWENTHAL .

    Read MoreRead Less